Dogfen lywodraethu ROSEMARY ALMSHOUSE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 10 JUN 2014 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2018 AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2018 AMENDED ON 20 AUG 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2022 as amended on 01 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING (BY WAY OF ALMSHOUSES) AND ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO ARE OVER 60 YEARS OF AGE AND (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES) TO BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES) WERE BORN IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OR ARE RESIDENT THERE AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO WIDOWS, SPINSTERS AND MARRIED COUPLES AS AFORESAID.
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.