Dogfen lywodraethu MISSION RABIES LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/04/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/05/2015 as amended on 06 Apr 2023 as amended on 26 Apr 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4. The charity's objects are: (a) throughout the world to protect and relieve dogs and other animals, in the directors discretion, from maltreatment, cruelty and suffering; and (b) to advance human health and animal welfare through: (i) veterinary training and veterinary advice and support; (ii) participating in initiatives for the global elimination of rabies; (iii) assisting with education projects relating to animal health, welfare and zoonotic diseases; (iv) assisting with the design and implementation of rabies vaccination, surveillance and education programmes; and (v) providing a global resource for use by organisations involved in the elimination of rabies and other diseases.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.