Dogfen lywodraethu THE LENCHWOOD TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MARCH 1968, AMENDED BY ORDER OF HM CHARITY COMMISSION 11/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 APR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 11 JUL 2023 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 DEC 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROVIDING: (1) ACCOMMODATION AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF REST, CONVALESCENCE, RECOVERY AND RECREATION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHRISTIANS OF ANY DENOMINATION AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE NEED OF THE FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND (2) RESIDENTIAL AND DAY FACILITIES AT BELOW COMMERCIAL RATES FOR CHRISTIAN CONFERENCES, CAMPS, RETREATS AND MEETINGS.
Maes buddion
AB LENCH, EVESHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.