Dogfen lywodraethu OPEN UP MUSIC
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 OCT 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAY 2016 as amended on 25 Jun 2018 as amended on 28 Apr 2020 as amended on 13 May 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are to help young disabled people, who are based in the United Kingdom, by developing and providing: a) opportunities to participate and perform in youth orchestras up to the age of 25; b) opportunities for personal and professional development up to the age of 27; c) accessible musical resources, including instruments and repertoire.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.