Dogfen lywodraethu PARTNERSHIP FOR OBSERVATION OF THE GLOBAL OCEAN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 20 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUL 2018 AMENDED ON 23 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 31 JAN 2020 AMENDED ON 23 JUN 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE OF GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY - ADVANCING EDUCATION IN GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION BY IDENTIFYING AREAS OF FURTHER STUDY FOR DEVELOPING THE SCIENCE OF GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION - THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH - THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS - THE PROMOTION OF INNOVATION AND TECHNOLOGY IN THE SCIENCE OF GLOBAL OCEAN OBSERVATION
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.