Dogfen lywodraethu THE NORMANDY MEMORIAL TRUST LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JUL 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONGST THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY CREATING A FITTING AND LASTING PERMANENT PUBLIC MEMORIAL IN NORMANDY, FRANCE TO THOSE MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH ARMED FORCES, INCLUDING MEMBERS OF OTHER SERVICES AND THOSE FROM THOSE NATIONS WHO FOUGHT DIRECTLY ALONGSIDE THEM, WHO GAVE THEIR LIVES IN THE LANDINGS ON "D-DAY", 6TH JUNE 1944, AND IN THE ASSOCIATED AND SUBSEQUENT FIGHTING WHICH IS COLLECTIVELY KNOWN AS THE "NORMANDY CAMPAIGN"".
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.