Dogfen lywodraethu THE PEVENSEY TOWN TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 20 FEB 2017 AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2017 as amended on 11 May 2018 as amended on 28 Mar 2019 as amended on 18 Nov 2019 as amended on 09 Jun 2020 as amended on 09 Jul 2021 as amended on 03 May 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE GRADE II LISTED PEVENSEY COURT HOUSE AND GAOL, MARKET SQUARE AND CATTLE MARKET BEING OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL MERIT; 2. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE COURT HOUSE AND GAOL AND ITS PLACE IN LOCAL AND NATIONAL HISTORY; 3. SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PEVENSEY AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.