Dogfen lywodraethu BETH SHALOM LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/09/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/1986 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 NOV 2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE RELIGION, PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY FOR OPENNESS, TRUTH AND RECONCILIATION BETWEEN RELIGIOUS AND ETHNIC GROUPS FROM ALL WALKS OF LIFE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO CHRISTIANITY AND JUDAISM, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF HUMANITARIANISM THROUGH INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING LESSONS OF THE HOLOCAUST, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM/COLLECTION DEDICATED TO THE EVENTS SURROUNDING THE HOLOCAUST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.