Dogfen lywodraethu TEDDY20 SUPPORTING CHILDREN WITH CANCER LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 AUG 2017 as amended on 04 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISIONS OF EQUIPMENT FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.