Dogfen lywodraethu EASTBOURNE DEMENTIA ACTION ALLIANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 26 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2020 AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2020 AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2021 as amended on 17 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY UNDERTAKING INITIATIVES TO HELP TO MAKE EASTBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS A DEMENTIA INCLUSIVE AND FRIENDLY COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY LISTENING AND RESPONDING TO THE LIVED EXPERIENCES OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, WORKSHOPS AND AWARENESS SESSIONS THAT ARE DESIGNED TO ENSURE THAT PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA FEEL UNDERSTOOD AND INCLUDED AND CAN CONFIDENTLY CONTRIBUTE TO COMMUNITY LIFE; BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN EAST SUSSEX AND ACROSS THE UK ON PROJECTS WHICH AIM TO IMPROVE THE CAPACITY OF COMMUNITIES TO SUPPORT PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.