Dogfen lywodraethu THE CATHERINE JAMES TRUST FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 JAN 1943 AS VARIED BY SCHEME 1 OCT 1991 AS AMENDED 19 DEC 1993 BY RESOLUTION UNDER S43(C) OF CA 1992 AS AMENDED 30 MAY 1997 BY RESOLUTION UNDER S74 OF CA 1993, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 6 JUNE 2004 UNDER S74 CA1993
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TWO SIXTHS PARTS OF THE NET ANNUAL INCOME TO AUGMENT THE MINISTER'S SALARY, IF BELOW MINIMUM STIPEND. 2. ONE SIXTH PART OR LESS FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS OR THE PROVISION OF PRIZES OR OF FILMS, GRAMOPHONES ETC. (3) ONE SIXTH PART OR LESS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CANDIDATES FOR THE MINISTRY AND TRAINING SUNDAY SCHOOL TEACHERS. (4) ONE SIXTH PART OR LESS TOWARDS AN EISTEDDFOD. (5) REMAINING SIXTH PART OR LESS FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG CHURCH MEMEBERS, ALL FOR DISTRIBUTION IN THE AREA OF THE PARISH OF THE WELSH CALVINISTIC METHODIST CHURCH AT PONTRHYDFENDDIGAID IN THE FORMER COUNTY OF CRDIGAN.(FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST)
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.