Dogfen lywodraethu OUSEBURN COMMUNITY CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 1981 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1981, 10 JUNE 1997, 8 JULY 2004 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SANDYFORD WARD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.