Dogfen lywodraethu DEWA TRUST FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 19 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2020 AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER AND CLOTHING, AND LIVELIHOOD PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS AND TRAINING CENTRES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAID PERSONS; 3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES SUCH AS TESTING AND TREATMENT CENTRES, HOSPITALS AND CLINICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.