Dogfen lywodraethu STAFFORD EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENT CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 26 NOVEMBER 1985, SCHEME (MODIFICATION) ORDER OF 29TH APRIL 1986 AND ORDERS DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2005, 1 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND RESOLUTION DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO PROVIDE, AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOLS CONCERNED, SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL IN STAFFORD. B. FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE ATTENDED ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL IN STAFFORD AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Maes buddion
STAFFORD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.