Dogfen lywodraethu CAMTAD HEARING SUPPORT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 1986, 7 DECEMBER 1991 AND 18 MAY 1996. AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2017 as amended on 26 Jun 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WITH ACQUIRED DEAFNESS AND OF HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE RESIDENT IN THE DERBYSHIRE AREA AND TO ENSURE THAT HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE HAVE THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE QUALITY OF LIFE, INDEPENDENCE IN DAILY LIVING ACTIVITIES AND FULL INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY. THE ORGANISATION WILL PROMOTE THE ACTIVE PARTICIPATION OF HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN ENSURING THAT THIS IS ACHIEVED.
Maes buddion
DERBYSHIRE AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.