Dogfen lywodraethu HEREFORDSHIRE COUNTY FEDERATION OF YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/11/1960 AS AMENDED ON 29/11/1971 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/1980 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/1986 AS AMENDED ON 25/10/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS. B) IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.