Dogfen lywodraethu LLAMAU LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/06/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/02/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND WELL BEING OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH MANNER OR WAY AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR TO MEET THE INDIVIDUAL'S HOLISTIC NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES PRIMARILY IN THE AREAS OF ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, ADVOCACY,EDUCATION,TRAINING,COUNSELLING AND THE REDUCTION AND PREVENTION OF OFFENDING
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.