Dogfen lywodraethu WHIZZ-KIDZ
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 APR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUL 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 AUG 2022 as amended on 16 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
“For the public benefit in the UK: • to relieve the needs and improve the lives of young wheelchair users and their families and carers; and • to promote the social inclusion of young wheelchair users by empowering them to be independent, including without limitation by providing them with the best possible wheelchairs and mobility equipment and support and confidence-building experiences.” In these objects young wheelchair users means children and young people aged up to 25 years requiring mobility assistance.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.