Dogfen lywodraethu BRIGHTLINGSEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION DATED 3 OCTOBER 1967 AS AMENDED ON 18 MAY 1998, 28 MAY 2002, 18 MAY 2004, 12 JULY 2005, 23 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2017 as amended on 07 Dec 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRIGHTLINGSEA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID BENEFICIARIES (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Maes buddion
BRIGHTLINGSEA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.