Dogfen lywodraethu FDM FOR DISABILITY MOBILITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/07/1997 AS AMENDED ON 18/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 16/12/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE RELIEF OF REGISTERED GROUP USERS IN LEEDS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND LOCAL INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE REGISTERED GROUP USERS IN LEEDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MINIBUS. B) TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE REGISTERED GROUP USERS IN LEEDS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES. A REGISTERED GROUP CAN BE A CLUB, RESIDENTIAL HOME/NURSING HOME, SHELTERED HOUSING COMPLEX OR AN ASSOCIATION WITH MEMBERS THAT HAVE DIFFICULTY ACCESSING PUBLIC TRANSPORT. GROUPS APPLICATIONS ARE SUBMITTED FOR APPROVAL OF THE BUS MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE TO MAKE SURE THEY MEET THE CRITERIA ABOVE.
Maes buddion
DOLPHIN MANOR AND SOUTH LEEDS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.