Dogfen lywodraethu YOUTH PARTICIPATION AND SUPPORT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2016 as amended on 06 Jul 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.to provide treatment for enuresis and other problems of bladder or bowel control, to children and adults; to provide counselling, advice, information, equipment or other aids or materials, to those suffering from enuresis or other problems of bladder or bowel control, and their families and carers, in order to assist in the treatment, management and alleviation of those problems and their effects upon daily life; to educate professionals, families and the public in the field of bladder or bowel control and their effects, to promote and provide services which are needed by children and adults suffering from problems of bladder or bowel control, and their families or carers,in direct or indirect consequences of those problems. 2. the promotion of health for the benefit of children and young adults in England and Wales who have problems of substance misuse, or are at risk of such problems, by the provision of treatment, intervention, education, counselling, information, advice and support to such children and young adults, and/or training, education, information, advice and support to their parents, carers or to professionals or others working with them. 3. the advancement of education for children in England and Wales by working with schools to enable their pupils' participation in public consultations carried out by parliamentary, national or local government departments or bodies or by other organisations, explaining to children the matters being consulted upon, and ascertaining, submitting and publishing their views on those matters. 4. the advancement of education for children in England and Wales by working with schools to assist in their pupils? language, literacy and communication skills.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.