Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE UNITED RELIGIONS INITIATIVE (UK)
Charity number: 1074982
Removed charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was incorporated on 6/6/2008 (Company Number: 6613407) and received a new charity registration number: 1124863 on 7/7/2008. During the period 1st November 2007 - 31st October 2008 the Trustees have sought to raise funds to promote the purpose of URI UK and more particularly educate the public, advance religion, theology and spirituality and the development of interfaith understanding a
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Total income: £34,036
Total expenditure: £31,675
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.