Accounts and annual returns THE UNITED RELIGIONS INITIATIVE (UK)

Charity number: 1074982
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2008 01 September 2009 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 27 August 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 06 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 06 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 20 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 20 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 28 March 2007 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 28 March 2007 148 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 07 April 2005 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 07 April 2005 66 days late