Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ELIZABETH CRANE
Charity Number: 239698-3
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1853 AND PROVED ON 24 DECEMBER 1855 AND RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCTOBER 2004 UNDER S.75 OF CA 1993
Charitable objects
TO BE PAID ON ST. THOMAS'S DAY TO AND AMONGST SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE BOROUGH OF RIBBESFORD.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF RIBBESFORD
Registration history
- 27 April 1965: Standard registration
- 16 February 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.