Charity overview ELIZABETH CRANE

Charity Number: 239698-3
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1853 AND PROVED ON 24 DECEMBER 1855 AND RESOLUTION DATED 19 OCTOBER 2004 UNDER S.75 OF CA 1993
Charitable objects
TO BE PAID ON ST. THOMAS'S DAY TO AND AMONGST SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE BOROUGH OF RIBBESFORD.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF RIBBESFORD
Registration history
  • 27 April 1965: Standard registration
  • 16 February 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of