Financial history THE ELIZABETH JANE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1000258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £52.06k £69.95k £83.47k £14.60k £2.49k
Total expenditure £27.84k £36.69k £95.58k £9.60k £13.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A