THE PREHISTORIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 November 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 November 2018 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 October 2016 On time Download