FRIENDS OF NORTHLANDS WOOD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1000765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 12 July 2021 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 31 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 31 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 31 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required