1ST EGHAM HYTHE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1000790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required