1ST EGHAM HYTHE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1000790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.37k £24.94k £31.08k £28.00k £28.60k
Total expenditure £13.82k £17.42k £17.45k £51.42k £44.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A