BOLTON CATHOLIC MUSICAL AND CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 23 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 08 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 09 September 2016 On time Download