BOLTON CATHOLIC MUSICAL AND CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £53.66k £43.44k £28.24k £47.17k £70.76k
Total expenditure £49.00k £38.03k £34.57k £45.34k £53.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A