Dogfen lywodraethu RIVER AND ROWING MUSEUM FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/01/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/12/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ESTABLISHMENT, MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF A MUSEUM AND GALLERY AT HENLEY WHICH COLLECTS, DOCUMENTS, PRESERVES, EXHIBITS AND INTERPRETS MATERIAL EVIDENCE AND ASSOCIATED INFORMATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND EDUCATION RELATING TO RIVERS ROWING AND HENLEY-ON-THAMES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN RIVERS ROWING AND HENLEY-ON-THAMES AND THEIR HISTORY AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RESEARCH AND EDUCATION THEREIN, AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE
Maes buddion
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.