U R C LINK

Charity number: 1001089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required