Financial history OAK WOOD SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/09/2016 15/09/2017 15/09/2018 15/09/2019 15/09/2020
Total gross income £8.43k £6.63k £0 £6 £0
Total expenditure £1.50k £325 £500 £1.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A