FRIENDS OF WHITTINGHAM PARISH BURIAL GROUND

Charity number: 1001409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.27k £4.96k £5.35k £4.71k £5.00k
Total expenditure £5.14k £5.80k £6.24k £3.90k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A