Financial history NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE HOSPICE CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1001614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £446.01k £688.81k £765.43k £638.87k £596.96k
Total expenditure £483.98k £555.58k £632.39k £618.33k £507.92k
Income from government contracts N/A £50.00k £50.00k £51.00k £51.00k
Income from government grants £50.00k N/A £120.34k £314.69k £12.88k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £83.96k £78.78k £257.68k £206.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £394.28k £313.89k £253.09k £388.77k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £167.90k £368.78k £43.13k £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £5 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £5.14k £2.82k £8.30k £1.16k
Income - Other N/A £37.53k £1.17k £76.67k £431
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £18.04k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £247.20k £141.96k £502.52k £236.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £308.38k £383.97k £86.71k £4.14k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.94k £5.24k £19.36k £7.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £4.17k £3.70k £45.48k £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £106.46k £29.10k £267.72k