THE VALENTINE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1001782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 06 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 26 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 26 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download