THE VALENTINE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1001782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £986.57k £1.08m £1.09m £1.10m £909.45k
Total expenditure £1.04m £1.10m £943.07k £1.19m £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £986.57k £1.08m £1.09m £1.10m £909.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £986.73k £1.05m £888.75k £1.13m £1.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.71k £52.57k £54.32k £53.82k £53.34k
Expenditure - Governance £71.53k £58.20k £80.45k £63.95k £51.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £915.20k £989.50k £808.30k £1.07m £1.13m
Expenditure - Investment management £49.71k £52.57k £54.32k £53.82k £53.34k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0