THE MORLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1001967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required