Financial history BIRMINGHAM CHRISTIAN COLLEGE

Charity number: 1002205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £217.66k £478.78k £339.74k £365.53k £303.54k
Total expenditure £148.48k £205.98k £262.91k £251.87k £270.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A