HARROW SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS

Charity number: 1002258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £603.29k £634.44k £648.52k £719.07k £608.36k
Total expenditure £452.45k £485.65k £451.68k £481.13k £480.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £27 £0 £0 £398
Income - Other trading activities £24.95k £19.27k £27.37k £30.72k £34.46k
Income - Charitable activities £577.63k £614.47k £612.21k £679.09k £564.05k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £716 £676 £8.94k £9.26k £9.44k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £433.38k £472.03k £432.01k £461.20k £463.55k
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.07k £13.62k £19.68k £19.93k £16.76k
Expenditure - Governance £2.80k £2.85k £3.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0