ACLAND BURGHLEY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1002280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.27k £15.78k £25.62k £10.68k £58.82k
Total expenditure £10.80k £10.32k £18.86k £2.86k £1.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £5.00k