Accounts and annual returns TOWER HAMLETS AND CANARY WHARF FURTHER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1002772
Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 160 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 160 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2018 07 November 2019 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 07 November 2019 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window