Financial history TOWER HAMLETS AND CANARY WHARF FURTHER EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1002772
Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/08/2017 01/09/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £53.11k £139.15k £131.09k £142.66k £140.47k
Total expenditure £58.77k £102.13k £88.93k £148.75k £141.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A