R A VESTEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1002784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 May 2020 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 03 May 2019 23 September 2020 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 03 May 2018 25 March 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 03 May 2017 05 April 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 03 May 2016 14 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 May 2016 Not Required