KENSINGTON AND CHELSEA MENTAL HEALTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1002986
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £634.40k £698.31k £669.53k £679.75k £649.75k
Total expenditure £574.70k £666.10k £663.34k £681.23k £677.70k
Income from government contracts £327.83k £327.83k £327.83k £327.83k £327.83k
Income from government grants £71.15k £61.15k £63.42k £68.81k £65.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.13k £5.02k £4.26k £8.44k £590
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £629.43k £691.99k £662.75k £668.22k £648.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.83k £1.30k £2.53k £3.08k £597
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £574.70k £656.03k £663.34k £681.23k £677.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.94k £10.06k £13.13k £15.24k £13.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0