Trustees We Change Lives (WCL)

Charity number: 1003023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Gore Chair 28 September 2015
None on record
Lenka Gaborova Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Peter Taberham Trustee 29 September 2018
None on record
Christopher Cardwell Howarth Trustee 29 September 2018
None on record
Peter Holmes Trustee 29 September 2018
None on record
Ian Fairbrother Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Janice Lorraine Wycherley Trustee 10 January 2014
None on record