STOCKFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1003108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £642.01k £785.01k £778.67k £687.89k £715.81k
Total expenditure £1.04m £593.29k £591.31k £609.12k £635.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £8.45k £20.73k £20.75k £27.50k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £568.40k £573.00k £572.60k £591.64k £587.92k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £38.00k £119.19k £118.39k £73.99k £71.82k
Income - Other £35.62k £84.38k £66.95k £1.51k £28.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £965.36k £593.29k £591.31k £609.12k £607.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £27.42k
Expenditure - Governance £60.02k £54.06k £51.44k £54.71k £49.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.11k £0 £0 £0 £27.42k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0