SPRINGFIELD ADVICE AND LAW CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1003145
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 February 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 March 2021 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 06 December 2016 On time Download